WIMBORNE UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides education, sporting and social activities for people in Wimborne and its surrounding locality who are no longer in full time gainful employment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Dorset
Governance
- 14 March 2003: Standard registration
- WIMBORNE U3A (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Horace Letchford | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
ASHLEY ROWLANDS | Trustee | 29 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victor Grayson | Trustee | 29 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Angela Letchford | Trustee | 29 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jayne Twomey | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.94k | £19.90k | £25.58k | £33.63k | £33.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.28k | £0 | £29.83k | £30.39k | £31.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 06 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 20 August 2024 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 DECEMBER 2002 AS AMENDED ON 19 NOVEMBER 2010.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE NO LONGER IN FULL TIME GAINFUL EMPLOYMENT IN WIMBORNE AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY. II) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR LEISURE TIME AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE ABOVE PERSONS IN THE INTERESTS OF THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE.
Area of benefit
WIMBORNE AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Cranfield Avenue
WIMBORNE
Dorset
BH21 1TH
- Phone:
- 07795060408
- Email:
- chair@wimborneu3a.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window