GOSS CROFT COMMUNITY HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides and maintains buildings and space to enable local residents to pursue interests.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 09 July 2003: Standard registration
- SEAGRY AND STARTLEY VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- SEAGRY, STARTLEY AND GREAT SOMERFORD VILLAGES' HALL (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DONALD IAN BLACKMORE | Chair | 21 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jane Sorrell | Trustee | 21 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Robert Alan Bentley | Trustee | 03 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anne Fentiman | Trustee | 18 February 2020 |
|
|||||
Antony Zehetmayr | Trustee | 26 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
David John Webber | Trustee | 28 June 2019 |
|
|||||
DOREEN JEVONS | Trustee | 12 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
BASIL PATRICK MILES | Trustee |
|
||||||
JENNIFER PATRICIA MARSDEN REEVES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AVIS JOAN BALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN HARRY CROSLAND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.04k | £17.36k | £30.21k | £19.68k | £26.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.45k | £17.83k | £17.04k | £23.18k | £26.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £18.53k | £2.68k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 16 September 2024 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 06 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 14 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 14 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 14 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 05/02/2004 AS AMENDED ON 05/09/2006 AS AMENDED ON 18/09/2012 as amended on 01 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
(1) THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AOB WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS. (2) THE LAND IDENTIFIED IN PART ONE OF THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME MUST BE RETAINED BY THE COMMITTEE FOR USE FOR THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
SEAGRY, STARTLEY AND GREAT SOMERFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Hall
Upper Seagry
CHIPPENHAM
Wiltshire
SN15 5HD
- Phone:
- 01249720866
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window