FIVE TALENT CHURCH INTERNATIONAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aim is to: i. further all endeavours to proclaim the word of God faithfully ii. further the work of evangelism, mission, stewardship and to promote common study of the Christian Faith iii. encourage the diversity of ministries in the church iv. widen and deepen understanding and fellowship among churches vi. help churches which may be weak, oppressed or persecuted
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Luton
- Northamptonshire
- Kenya
- Malawi
- Mozambique
- Nigeria
- South Africa
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 22 December 2003: Standard registration
- 17 December 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- FTCI (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2005 | 31/10/2006 | 31/10/2008 | 31/10/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.44k | £5.44k | £2.22k | £1.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.70k | £5.26k | £2.03k | £1.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2016 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 OCTOBER 2002 AS AMENDED BY WRITTEN RESOLUTION DATED 8 NOVEMBER 2003.
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN LUTON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD (PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN MALAWI) AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY (HEREIN CALLED "THE TRUSTEES") MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY; (B) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS O F NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE SAID LOCATIONS AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (C) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE INCLUDING BY MEANS OF ESTABLISHING AND OPERATING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT OR ESTABLISHMENTS IN THE SAID LOCATIONS AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
LUTON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD (PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN MALAWI.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window