HAMSTEAD MINERS MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We maintain our Memorial to the miners of Hamstead colliery at the corner of Hamstead Road and the Old Walsall Road and hold a memorial service there every year. We also maintain a museum at the Tanhouse Community Centre in Hamstead Road. We give talks to schools and groups onn the mining community to remind people of the hardships and lifestyle of miners.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
People

No information available
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Birmingham City
- Sandwell
Governance
- 23 July 2003: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £383 | £370 | £344 | £1.00k | £147 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.76k | £834 | £371 | £1.35k | £821 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 828 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 828 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1193 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1193 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1558 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1558 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 APRIL 2003
Charitable objects
I) TO PROMOTE AND STIMULATE THE STUDY AND GENERAL KNOWLEDGE OF THE HISTORY AND HERITAGE OF THE ARE OF HAMSTEAD, AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE HISTORY OF THE MINING INDUSTRY IN THIS AREA, AND OF LOCAL HISTORY IN GENERAL WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING AND ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC. II) TO PROMOTE AND STIMULATE THE STUDY AND GENERAL KNOWLEDGE OF THE HUMANITIES, ARTS AND SCIENCES WITH THE OBJECT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC III) TO ESTABLISH, SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, OR MAKE AVAILABLE A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE") IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE EDUCATION, USE AND RECREATION OF THE PUBLIC AND TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS THE CHARITY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
HAMSTEAD, BIRMINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 NEWTON MANOR CLOSE
BIRMINGHAM
B43 5JZ
- Phone:
- 01213577264
- Email:
- hamsteadminers@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window