Accounts and annual returns THE DAVIS FAMILY TRUST

Charity number: 1097012
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2015 18 January 2017 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2014 22 February 2016 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2013 09 March 2015 129 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not Required