HOSPITIUM SANCTI IOANNI ELEMOSINARII - POLISH VOLUNTEERS OF SAINT JOHN THE ALMSGIVER

Charity number: 1098308
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity is formed by volunteers of Polish origin who seek to help the poor and sick, following in the footsteps of St John the Almsgiver, to advance the Christian religion and relieve sickness, poverty and distress, in particular but not exclusively to Poles or those of Polish descent.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London
  • France
  • Poland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 July 2003: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
WLADYSLAW CIECHANOWSKI Trustee
None on record
COUNTESS MARIA-HELENA ZAMOYSKA Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £92 £0 £4.98k £0 £0
Total expenditure £2.03k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 12 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 01 November 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 November 2021 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ULICA JAGODY 2
WARSAW 04-862
Phone:
0048667661940
Website:

No information available