FRIENDS OF RISHTON YOUTH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide activities and facilities for the young people of Rishton to help integrate them into the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lancashire
Governance
- 28 January 2003: Standard registration
- 13 November 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- F.R.Y. (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2009 | 30/09/2010 | 30/09/2011 | 30/09/2012 | 30/09/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2 | £0 | £100 | £0 | £1 | |
|
Total expenditure | £14 | £0 | £296 | £100 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2013 | 07 November 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2012 | 07 November 2013 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2011 | 18 June 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2010 | 14 November 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 APRIL 2002.
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO SUPPORT AND WORK WITH THE YOUTH OF RISHTON TO PROVIDE FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT FOR POSITIVE LEISURE ACTIVITIES AND TO ENCOURAGE YOUNG PEOPLE TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE WIDER COMMUNITY LIFE OF RISHTON.
Area of benefit
LANCASHIRE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window