CZECH ROMA COMMUNITY OF LIVERPOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 02 June 2003: Standard registration
- 24 March 2022: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 NOVEMBER 2002 AS AMENDED 7 MAY 2003
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN MERSEYSIDE, AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC WHO ARE OF CZECH ORIGIN BY RELIEVING THOSE PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS BY ADVANCING EDUCATION AND BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THOSE PERSONS, AND 2) FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OF CZECH REFUGEES WHO ARE RESIDENT OR WHO ARE INTENDING TO RESIDE IN THE UK BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH FREE AND CONFIDENTIAL ADVICE, ASSISTANCE, REPRESENTATION, COUNSELLING, TRANSLATION AND INTERPRETING SERVICES IN MATTERS SUCH AS IMMIGRATION, FINANCE, DEBTS, WELFARE BENEFITS, HEALTH, HOUSING, SOCIAL SECURITY, EDUCATION, TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT.
Area of benefit
MERSEYSIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window