FRIENDS OF FIELD COURT JUNIOR SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organise fundraising & social events for pupils, parents, staff & wider community. All money raised is donated to the school for extra activities and equipment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 24 February 2003: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF F C J S (Working name)
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Crystal Gaulder | Trustee | 19 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Taylor | Trustee | 19 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARY ELIZABETH DAVIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.43k | £4.33k | £3.64k | £2.99k | £6.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.20k | £1.97k | £2.66k | £1.40k | £3.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 01 July 2024 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 15 June 2022 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 09 June 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 09 June 2021 | 374 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 OCTOBER 2002
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE. FIELD COURT JUNIOR SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
FIELD COURT JUNIOR SCHOOL
COURTFIELD ROAD
QUEDGELEY
GLOUCESTER
GL2 4UF
- Phone:
- 01452720066
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window