DAYTRIPPERS LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Helps children/Young people. People with disabilities. Other charities/Voluntary bodies
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 01 May 2003: Standard registration
- 08 December 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2016 | 31/10/2017 | 31/10/2018 | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.03k | £94.22k | £93.74k | £113.02k | £79.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.29k | £83.07k | £82.94k | £93.72k | £97.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 11 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 11 June 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2018 | 20 September 2019 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 October 2018
(These accounts |
20 September 2019 | 20 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 OCTOBER 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 7 APRIL 2003
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF HOLIDAYS OR OTHER RECREATIONAL FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF CHILDREN OR YOUNG PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE LONDON, ESSEX, HERTFORDSHIRE, BERKSHIRE AND KENT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window