NATIONAL GROCERS BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We tackle hardship amongst those who have worked or are working in the grocery trade, whether in manufacturing, distribution, wholesale or retail. We give financial help via regular and one-off crisis grants, and supply essential household items and independent living aids. We offer practical and emotional support for a wide range of personal and welfare issues via our 24/7 helpline and website.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£15,850,964
Donations and legacies | £2.38m | |
Charitable activities | £13.08m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £392.71k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£15,728,287
Raising funds | £9.02m | |
Charitable activities | £6.70m | |
Other | £6.31k |
£521,593 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £9.02m | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.70m | |
Retained for future use | £122.68k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £9.02m | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.70m | |
Retained for future use | £644.27k |
People

53 Employee(s)
14 Trustee(s)
648 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 3 |
£70k to £80k | 3 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
One or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 10 February 2003: Standard registration
- 16 August 2013: Funds received from 1109578 THE CONFECTIONERS BENEVOLENT FUND
- 25 March 2022: Funds received from 803723 THE TESCO RETIRED STAFF ASSOCIATION CARING FUND
- 24 August 2022: Funds received from 260075 THE CHARITABLE FUND OF THE JOINT INDUSTRIAL COUNCI...
- GROCERYAID (Working name)
- CARAVAN (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RUSTON ARTHUR MARK SMITH | Chair | 21 February 2008 |
|
|
||||
Alison Cheung | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Crampton | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Richard Williamson | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Tatum | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAWOOD PERVEZ | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Mark McKenzie | Trustee | 04 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Louise Anne Stigant | Trustee | 24 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Helen Elizabeth Murray | Trustee | 24 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
LORRAINE DENISE HENDLE | Trustee | 22 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
HELEN MARY TUCKER | Trustee | 19 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
JASON CHARLES UTTLEY | Trustee | 16 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARK PAUL SMITH | Trustee | 16 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
BART WALLACE DALLA MURA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.02m | £8.73m | £12.23m | £14.61m | £15.85m | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.67m | £6.67m | £12.39m | £14.41m | £15.73m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £31.82k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.07m | £5.15m | £2.26m | £2.25m | £2.38m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £6.67m | £3.36m | £9.50m | £12.08m | £13.08m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £279.29k | £223.11k | £239.50k | £275.05k | £392.71k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £280.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £4.07m | £5.05m | £5.60m | £5.56m | £6.70m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £4.60m | £1.62m | £6.78m | £8.84m | £9.02m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £210.69k | £0 | £0 | £184.82k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £6.31k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.16m | £1.17m | £1.30m | £1.48m | £1.47m | |
|
Long-term investments | £7.33m | £8.95m | £9.90m | £9.58m | £10.40m | |
|
Other assets | £3.77m | £7.60m | £7.88m | £10.97m | £13.44m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £3.34m | £5.33m | £6.13m | £9.46m | £12.10m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/12/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/11/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/10/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/02/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/02/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27 JUN 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE:- 3.1.1 THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE WHO: (A) ARE OR HAVE BEEN ENGAGED IN THE GROCERY TRADE, IN ANY CAPACITY; OR (B) ARE THE SURVIVING SPOUSE, CIVIL PARTNER OR OTHERWISE LONG TERM PARTNER OR CHILD (OR OTHER DEPENDANT OR FORMER DEPENDANT) OF PERSONS WHO HAVE BEEN ENGAGED IN THE GROCERY TRADE; AND 3.1.2 TO UNDERTAKE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. IN THIS ARTICLE 3, “GROCERY TRADE” MEANS ANY WORK RELATING TO THE MANUFACTURING, LOGISTICS, DISTRIBUTION AND SALES OF GROCERIES OR OTHER PRODUCTS TYPICALLY SOLD IN SUPERMARKETS, WHETHER WHOLESALE OR RETAIL. FOR THE AVOIDANCE OF DOUBT, THIS DEFINITION SHALL INCLUDE THE OFF-LICENCE TRADE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIT 2
LAKESIDE BUSINESS PARK
SWAN LANE
SANDHURST
BERKSHIRE
GU47 9DN
- Phone:
- 01252875925
- Email:
- info@groceryaid.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window