Accounts and annual returns COMMUNITY LEISURE ASSOCIATION OF WHITWORTH LIMITED

Charity number: 1098147
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 02 November 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 January 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On Time