FRIENDS OF THE DATCHET HEALTH CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of sickness and the protection of good health. Provision and maintenance and improvement of Datchet Health Centre and other institutions providing medical treatment. Relief of patients after hospital discharge To assist other charities relating to health care
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 02 July 2003: Standard registration
- 23 July 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.60k | £1.75k | £5.11k | £256 | £627 | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.90k | £5.77k | £615 | £8.95k | £492 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 25 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 04 March 2013 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 2 MAY 2003
Charitable objects
I) FOR THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT WHICH NEITHER THE DOCTORS NOR THE HEALTH SERVICE ARE ABLE TO PROVIDE. II) TO ASSIST OR PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE ORGANISATION OR CHARITABLE PURPOSE RELATING TO HEALTHCARE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
DATCHET BERKSHIRE AND ITS ENVIRONS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window