THE COMBE MARTIN TOWN HALL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To manage and maintain The Village Hall for the use of the public for social, educational and religious functions and fundraising activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 29 August 2003: Standard registration
- 03 March 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- COMBE MARTIN VILLAGE HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2006 | 28/02/2007 | 29/02/2008 | 28/02/2009 | 28/02/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.35k | £5.55k | £12.97k | £14.18k | £11.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.01k | £7.01k | £5.23k | £16.77k | £12.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2010 | 17 January 2011 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2009 | 20 November 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2009 | 09 December 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 29 February 2008 | 06 February 2009 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2008 | 03 May 2009 | 125 days late | |
Annual return | 28 February 2007 | 18 September 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2006 | 09 May 2007 | 132 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2006 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 30 OCTOBER 1995
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A TOWN HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF COMBE MARTIN AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
INHABITANTS OF COOMBE MARTIN AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window