Financial history THE DORE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1096562
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £4.20k £43.04k £483 £50 £0
Total expenditure £10.22k £43.50k £0 £4.20k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0