THE PUBLIC CATALOGUE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Art UK is a cultural education charity on a mission to make the art in UK public collections accessible to everyone, for enjoyment, learning and research. We enable global audiences to learn about the nation's art collection by digitising artworks, telling the stories behind the art and creating exciting opportunities for public interaction with art, both online and offline.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£2,290,292
Donations and legacies | £2.07m | |
Charitable activities | £168.76k | |
Other trading activities | £37.50k | |
Investments | £12.21k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,057,959
Raising funds | £97.83k | |
Charitable activities | £1.96m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £351,549 from 5 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £97.83k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.96m | |
Retained for future use | £232.33k |
People

35 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
112 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 24 February 2003: Standard registration
- Art UK (Working name)
- PCF (Working name)
- THE PUBLIC CATALOGUE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Gwyn DAVIES | Chair | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
LISA WONG | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Avril Catherine Burns MARTINDALE | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Caroline Margaret CAMPBELL | Trustee | 31 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jago COOPER | Trustee | 12 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Ruth HAYDEN | Trustee | 12 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sherece RAINFORD | Trustee | 12 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Frederick STACK | Trustee | 08 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine HOLDEN | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Professor Carola BOEHM | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hasan BAKHSHI | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas MARKS | Trustee | 14 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.26m | £2.00m | £1.52m | £1.94m | £2.29m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.33m | £1.79m | £1.70m | £1.66m | £2.06m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500.00k | £379.90k | £302.29k | £444.99k | £351.55k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.15m | £1.86m | £1.36m | £1.79m | £2.07m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £18.75k | £37.50k | £21.88k | £37.50k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £107.48k | £126.73k | £124.74k | £126.92k | £168.76k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £107 | £52 | £231 | £1.05k | £12.21k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.21m | £1.67m | £1.59m | £1.53m | £1.96m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £114.71k | £119.62k | £116.70k | £132.08k | £97.83k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £8.54k | £9.19k | £9.50k | £10.55k | £11.30k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £237.94k | £240.08k | £186.96k | £284.19k | £445.50k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £333.19k | £544.61k | £362.47k | £603.32k | £688.02k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £337.08k | £337.61k | £285.42k | £346.96k | £360.65k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25 OCT 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 DEC 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
1 TO RESEARCH, PUBLISH AND DISTRIBUTE INFORMATION IN RELATION TO, AND TO PROMOTE, PUBLISH AND PROVIDE CATALOGUES OF PAINTINGS, SCULPTURES AND OTHER WORKS OF ART, INCLUDING ASSOCIATING WITH MUSEUMS, ART GALLERIES AND ORGANISATIONS AFFILIATED WITH ART, IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE ARTS AND EDUCATION GENERALLY; 2 TO ENCOURAGE, ASSIST, ARRANGE AND PROVIDE SUPPORT FOR THE RESTORATION OF PAINTINGS, SCULPTURES AND WORKS OF ART HELD OR OWNED BY MUSEUMS, ART GALLERIES AND OTHER BODIES AND ORGANISATIONS MAKING WORKS OF ART AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC AND TO COOPERATE WITH, ASSIST AND SUPPORT SUCH MUSEUMS, ART GALLERIES AND OTHER BODIES IN CONNECTION WITH THE SAME; 3 TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE WORKS OF ART AND THE ARTS IN GENERAL FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, INCLUDING THE ARTS OF PAINTING, DRAWING, SCULPTURE, PHOTOGRAPHY AND DESIGN AND TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN AND ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION AND APPRECIATION OF, AND PUBLIC INTEREST IN, THE ARTS GENERALLY; 4 TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES, INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITATION CHARITABLE MUSEUMS, ART GALLERIES AND OTHER CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS MAKING WORKS OF ART AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC AND THE EFFECTIVE USE OF CHARITABLE RESOURCES IN THE ARTS SECTOR; AND 5 TO CARRY OUT SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS WHICH THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER TO BE ANCILLARY OR COMPLIMENTARY TO ANY OF THE FOREGOING OBJECTS OR WHICH MAY BE UNDERTAKEN IN CONNECTION OR CONJUNCTION THEREWITH
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
TC Group
The Courtyard
Shoreham Road,Upper Beeding
STEYNING
West Sussex
BN44 3TN
- Phone:
- 01158386175
- Email:
- info@artuk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window