Financial history SHEFFIELD PARTNERSHIP ADVICE AND INFORMATION NETWORK

Charity Number: 1096754
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009
Total gross income £130.34k £180.60k £201.15k £176.36k £121.75k
Total expenditure £193.63k £182.36k £224.28k £167.14k £179.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A