ROCHDALE EDUCATION AND LEARNING TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rochdale Education and Learning Trust was set up in 2001 by all the schools in Rochdale - nursery, primary, special and secondary - to meet their professional development needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Rochdale
Governance
- 03 April 2003: Standard registration
- REAL TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marcin Kojder | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
David John Dalziel | Trustee | 05 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Thomas Owen | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Dardis | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katie Charlton | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Armitage | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARCUS COCKCROFT | Trustee | 06 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £324.49k | £299.10k | £274.16k | £321.55k | £286.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £331.59k | £230.89k | £286.57k | £321.76k | £328.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 SEPTEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
IN THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF ROCHDALE AND ITS ENVIRONS ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT"), TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND EDUCATION STANDARDS PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES SHALL NOT UNDERTAKE ANY ACTIVITIES THAT EXTEND TO RELIEVING ANY LOCAL AUTHORITIES OR OTHER BODIES OF A STATUTORY DUTY TO PROVIDE OR IMPROVE EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF ROCHDALE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Edgar Wood Academy
Heywood Old Road
Heywood
OL10 2QN
- Phone:
- 01706926708
- Email:
- info@realtrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window