Trustees SHROPSHIRE CHILD CONTACT CENTRE
Charity number: 1096556

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAT BARROW | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Valerie Collard | Trustee | 08 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne-marie Campbell | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Russell Collard | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
St John Peter Payne | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Bates | Trustee | 15 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Rowson | Trustee | 29 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Maree Painter | Trustee | 10 October 2014 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.