Financial history THE GAMBIA HORSE AND DONKEY TRUST

Charity Number: 1096814
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £173.23k £240.56k £187.05k £371.41k £268.97k
Total expenditure £212.82k £214.12k £252.09k £293.35k £297.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A