Financial history THE GUILD OF OUR LADY OF GOOD COUNSEL

Charity number: 1096617
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £411.45k £330.37k £343.61k £329.25k £542.99k
Total expenditure £385.72k £290.17k £402.11k £413.76k £502.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.93k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £497.74k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £45.17k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £71
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £85.37k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £472.23k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £30.15k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £3.35k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £224.79k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0