Financial history THE VANESSA GRANT TRUST

Charity number: 1098865
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £196.48k £322.22k £242.74k £272.76k £151.07k
Total expenditure £211.11k £307.17k £213.10k £180.43k £289.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A