THE BLUEBERRY HILL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1096665
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

General charitable activities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024

Total income: £229,359
Total expenditure: £239,365

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 March 2003: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Iain Young Trustee 29 January 2018
None on record
JONATHAN ROBERT DREW Trustee
None on record
Sir GRAHAM LLOYD WRIGLEY Trustee
CHILWORTH VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
THE HIMALAYAN TRUST UK CIO
Recently registered
THE BLUEBERRY HILL CIO
Recently registered
ANNA MARIA WRIGLEY Trustee
THE BLUEBERRY HILL CIO
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £54.58k £11.47k £43.05k £71.47k £229.36k
Total expenditure £182.18k £118.98k £151.76k £275.07k £239.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 13 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 13 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 02 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 02 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 11 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 11 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 27 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 04 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 04 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
CHILWORTH MANOR
HALFPENNY LANE
CHILWORTH
GUILDFORD
GU4 8NN
Phone:
01483561414
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available