Financial history ST GREGORY'S CHILD CARE TRUST

Charity number: 1099491
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £323.19k £382.52k £415.38k £474.94k £514.93k
Total expenditure £392.98k £425.75k £401.31k £437.17k £489.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.50k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £509.80k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £4.93k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £200
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £485.87k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £3.16k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £438.29k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0