OXFORDSHIRE COMMUNITY EDUCATION GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of Education of young people of African and Caribbean descent so that they can take a positive and active role in UK and Africa in general To provide support (financial and teaching materials) to the Arts school in Ethiopia and to 20 children from poor background at the Future steps academy, in Nigeria To fund raise at organized park events in England
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 03 November 2003: Standard registration
- OCEG (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eileen Rowe-McKenzie | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Micah Roachford | Trustee | 27 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Dixon | Trustee | 27 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dolcie OBHIOZELE | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 June 2024 | 138 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 March 2023 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 March 2021 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 JUNE 1999 AS AMENDED 26 SEPTEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE OF AFRICAN AND CARIBBEAN DESCENT SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEM MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE OXFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
55 Long Lane
OXFORD
OX4 3TN
- Phone:
- 07877284936
- Email:
- dolcieobhiozele@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window