Financial history RISBY SCHOOL P T A

Charity number: 1096141
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £9.03k £5.19k £6.44k £13.99k £14.18k
Total expenditure £6.67k £9.97k £5.93k £4.11k £14.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A