RAVENSTONE PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Parent Teacher Association. Funding of additional facilities, resources, equipment for school to enhance learning experience for all pupils.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 21 February 2003: Standard registration
- Friends of Ravenstone (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gemma Walker | Chair | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thanh Pham Chi LE | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
GEORGETTE AMY PHILLIPS | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA PALING | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.41k | £72.29k | £48.47k | £28.15k | £32.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.86k | £50.10k | £53.83k | £42.50k | £41.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 02 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 18 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 OCTOBER 2002
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL OR TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
RAVENSTONE PRIMARY SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
RAVENSTONE PRIMARY SCHOOL
RAVENSTONE STREET
LONDON
SW12 9SS
- Phone:
- 020 8673 0594
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window