Financial history PARENTS/FRIENDS AT LONG MEADOW SCHOOL (P A L S)

Charity Number: 1095870
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £8.65k £7.99k £17.20k £16.73k £16.00k
Total expenditure £8.35k £7.82k £7.34k £17.64k £21.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A