KAISER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A broad range of projects are supported including student sponsorship and prizes, grants for educational and community resources and heritage conservation including industrial archaeology. The support of animal charities is also a feature of our work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 April 2003: Standard registration
- KAISER TRUST FOUNDATION (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anna Eleanor West | Trustee | 06 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clive Henry West | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
GLENNIS JEAN RATHIE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.81k | £7.92k | £4.27k | £0 | £7.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.80k | £7.91k | £3.97k | £0 | £7.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 06 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 JANUARY 2003 AS AMENDED 1 APRIL 2003.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND RELIGION BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS FOR SUCH ITEMS AS ACADEMIC AND EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS THAT WILL HELP FURTHER EDUCATION PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONG YOUNG PEOPLE ANYWHERE IN AND AROUND THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ABROAD.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 CAVENDISH ROAD
HAZEL GROVE
STOCKPORT
CHESHIRE
SK7 6HY
- Phone:
- 01625878604
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window