Financial history HACKNEY CYPRIOT ASSOCIATION ADVICE AND COMMUNITY CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1097727
Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £44.95k £98.53k £65.00k £58.28k £135.84k
Total expenditure £51.03k £56.04k £64.98k £79.40k £138.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £13.41k £62.41k
Income from government grants £10.93k £64.38k £25.97k N/A £16.67k