HACKNEY CYPRIOT ASSOCIATION ADVICE AND COMMUNITY CENTRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Advice service 2 days a week between 10:00 and 15:00. Clients can make use of the service on a drop-in basis. Appointments can also be arranged in advance. Luncheon Club service for the elderly people living in Hackney on Tuesdays, Wednesday and Thursdays. The Luncheon Club provides two-course traditional Cypriot cuisine meals for 4.00 per person.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £62,414 from 2 government contract(s) and £16,672 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hackney
Governance
- 29 May 2003: Standard registration
- 02 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 20 November 2009: Standard registration
- HACKNEY CYPRIOT ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kristina Georgiou | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Irene Kadis | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cagri Cosar | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nurgul Balli | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ayse Yalinca | Trustee | 31 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gorkem Cavli | Trustee | 15 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Diva Ulucay | Trustee | 29 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.95k | £98.53k | £65.00k | £58.28k | £135.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.03k | £56.04k | £64.98k | £79.40k | £138.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £13.41k | £62.41k | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.93k | £64.38k | £25.97k | N/A | £16.67k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 February 2025 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 February 2025 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 February 2024 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 February 2024 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 25 OCTOBER 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 17 APRIL 2003
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE (A) THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT HEALTH AND ASSIST IN THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS, PARTICULARLY AMONGST THE CYPRIOT COMMUNITY IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HACKNEY, AND FOR THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. (B) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
IN PARTICULAR THE CYPRIOT COMMUNITY IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HACKNEY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 BALLS POND ROAD
LONDON
N1 4AX
- Phone:
- 02072547920
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window