Accounts and annual returns VICTIM SUPPORT ESSEX

Charity number: 1096254
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2008 24 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2008 24 November 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 31 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 31 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 25 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 25 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 23 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 23 January 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 10 November 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 10 November 2004 On Time