FRIENDS OF STRADBROKE HIGH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A group of volunteers raising funds to enhance the education of the pupils of Stradbroke High School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Suffolk
Governance
- 18 February 2003: Standard registration
- FOSBEC (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF STRADBROKE BUSINESS AND ENTERPRISE COLLEGE (Previous name)
- FRIENDS OF STRADBROKE HIGH ASSOC (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carla Ward | Chair | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Sanders | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Whitfield | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Colling-Blackman | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Edward Hanlon Mr | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Leona Lee-Lozone Mrs | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.51k | £3.16k | £2.57k | £2.44k | £6.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.34k | £1.93k | £4.68k | £6.31k | £4.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 15 December 2020 | 138 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21/01/2003 AS AMENDED ON 14/05/2012 as amended on 07 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS;
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE STRADBROKE HIGH SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Stradbroke High School
Wilby Road
Stradbroke
EYE
Suffolk
IP21 5JN
- Phone:
- 01379384387
- Email:
- stradfriends@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window