Accounts and annual returns OCTAVIA HILL HOUSING TRUST GIFT FUND

Charity Number: 1096046
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2007 31 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 30 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 12 February 2007 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 30 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 15 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 15 November 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 28 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 28 January 2005 On Time