Financial history SUNFLOWERS PRE-SCHOOL WOOLSERY

Charity number: 1096000
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2011
Total gross income £41.62k £36.05k £32.80k £27.41k £50.28k
Total expenditure £35.88k £33.61k £28.51k £26.01k £33.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A