Accounts and annual returns THE OLD JESHWANG LOWER BASIC SCHOOL

Charity number: 1097453
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2016 16 May 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 13 September 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2014 05 June 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required