Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF CALLOW END SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1096078
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 01 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 01 October 2024 93 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 14 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 14 February 2023 229 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 04 May 2022 308 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required