Financial history ILKLEY PLAYERS LIMITED

Charity number: 1096090
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £218.30k £105.38k £177.91k £197.13k £251.72k
Total expenditure £224.00k £132.10k £164.11k £227.18k £243.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £87.20k £18.38k £1.00k N/A