BOREHAMWOOD AND ELSTREE UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (U3A)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide opportunities for semi-retired and retired people to enjoy and engage in educational and cultural activities through regular meetings in groups across a wide range of subjects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 24 February 2003: Standard registration
- BOREHAMWOOD AND ELSTREE U3A (Working name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Judith Philippa Sear | Chair | 18 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Kirk | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Madeleine Wells | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Manning | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sue Radford | Trustee | 18 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Whittington | Trustee | 18 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Laskey | Trustee | 15 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Tarrant | Trustee | 15 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
GLORIA KATHLEEN BAKALL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.02k | £0 | £2.99k | £4.83k | £4.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.85k | £1.71k | £2.35k | £4.26k | £3.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 March 2024 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 February 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2022 | 369 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 NOVEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF MIDDLE AGED AND OLDER PEOPLE WHO ARE NOT IN FULL TIME GAINFUL EMPLOYMENT IN BOREHAMWOOD AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY. II) PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR LEISURE TIME AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE ABOVE PERSONS IN THE INTERESTS OF THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE.
Area of benefit
BOREHAMWOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Croxdale Road
BOREHAMWOOD
Hertfordshire
WD6 4PY
- Phone:
- 02082071976
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window