SEND SCHOOLS’ PARENTS TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the pupils in the school in particular by: 1) developing effective relationships between staff, parents and others associated with the school; 2) engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which support the school and advance the education of pupils.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
Governance
- 24 February 2003: Standard registration
- 29 June 2016: Funds received from 1015329 SEND FIRST SCHOOL PARENTS TEACHERS ASSOCIATION
- ST BEDES SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- ST BEDE'S JUNIOR SCHOOL PTA (Previous name)
- ST BEDES SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carly Howorth | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Murdoch | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Jane Jack | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.72k | £1.03k | £20.50k | £9.71k | £6.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.26k | £253 | £15.25k | £5.72k | £8.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £1.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 03 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27/06/2002 AS AMENDED ON 24/01/2012 AS AMENDED ON 05/10/2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS;
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE ST BEDE'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND JUNIOR SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Send Schools PTFA
Send C of E First School
Send Barns Lane
Send
Woking
GU23 7BS
- Phone:
- 01483223464
- Email:
- sendschoolsptfa@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window