Financial history BATH MINERVA CHOIR

Charity number: 1098142
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £35.59k £26.56k £39.88k £37.32k £40.12k
Total expenditure £28.33k £14.73k £33.48k £35.05k £45.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A