Trustees BATH MINERVA CHOIR
Charity number: 1098142

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hilary Stanton | Chair | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Hannah | Trustee | 24 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Brooks Harris Thomas | Trustee | 24 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher McGrail | Trustee | 19 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Anne Smith | Trustee | 21 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA HAWKES | Trustee | 23 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM STARLING | Trustee | 25 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN STRANG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FRANCES ANSELL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.