JEWS' TEMPORARY SHELTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity was originally set up to provide assistance to Jews from Eastern Europe. The charity continues to provide assistance by making grants to applicants with housing or household needs or who require support for emergency accomodation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Scotland
Governance
- 29 July 2003: Standard registration
- JTS (Working name)
- JTS HOUSING FUND JEWS TEMPORARY SHELTER (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RALPH JULIAN ELMAN FCA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Marcia Levy | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|||||
PAUL NICHOLAS WOOLF | Trustee | 21 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN PAUL ADLER | Trustee | 22 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA GOLDBURG | Trustee | 22 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev BERNARD KOSCHLAND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £145.27k | £115.33k | £127.00k | £125.62k | £132.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £167.76k | £158.75k | £190.77k | £176.95k | £165.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 08 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 FEBRUARY 2003
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF IN CASES OF NEED OF PERSONS OF THE FOLLOWING CLASSES IN THE FOLLOWING ORDER PRIORITY BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION AND OTHER ITEMS, SERVICES AND FACILITIES CALCULATED TO RELIEVE THE NEED OF SUCH PERSONS: 1. IMMIGRANT AND TRANS-MIGRANT PERSONS OF THE JEWISH FAITH 2. PERSONS OF THE JEWISH FAITH 3. OTHER PERSONS COLLECTIVELY AND INDIVIDUALLY KNOWN AS ''BENEFICIARIES''
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
FMCB
Hathaway House
Popes Drive
LONDON
N3 1QF
- Phone:
- 07546519043
- Email:
- rachel@jts.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window