CHINA CHILDREN AND TEENAGERS' FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
AMELIORATE CONDITION OF DISADVANTAGED CHILDREN AND YOUTH IN CHINA BY PROVISION OF EMOTIONAL, SOCIAL, ENVIRONMENTAL & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT OPPORTUNITIES THROUGH EDUCATION, TRAINING, CULTURAL, HEALTHCARE, COMMUNITY & FAMILY SUPPORT PROJECTS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- China
Governance
- 01 August 2003: Standard registration
- 24 March 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
- CCTF UK (Working name)
- CHILDREN IN CHINA (Working name)
- CHINA'S CHILDREN CHARITY (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2010 | 31/07/2011 | 31/07/2012 | 31/07/2013 | 31/07/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £113.93k | £61.73k | £1.51k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £164.26k | £100.50k | £20.09k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2014 | 14 November 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2013 | 08 November 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 JULY 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 8 FEBRUARY 2007.
Charitable objects
3.1 TO RELIEVE POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING OF CHILDREN AND TEENAGERS IN CHINA THROUGH THE PROVISION OF CARE AND FOSTERING AND SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ASSISTANCE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC ACCORDING TO ENGLISH LAW AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL DECIDE; AND 3.2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND TEENAGERS IN CHINA FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
CHINA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window