Financial history THE UK FLAGSHIP

Charity Number: 1100118
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2008 31/01/2009 31/01/2010 31/01/2011 31/01/2012
Total gross income £270 £0 £3.36k £1.54k £0
Total expenditure £6.93k £660 £4.17k £391 £138
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A