Financial history THE GRAIN HOUSE TRUST

Charity number: 1096632
Charity reporting is up to date (24 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £526.47k £439.44k £512.45k £500.95k £526.59k
Total expenditure £485.29k £391.76k £377.01k £410.05k £442.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £34.06k £62.83k N/A N/A £3.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £429.04k N/A £413.53k £383.81k £390.67k
Income - Other trading activities £94.62k N/A £98.51k £116.56k £132.79k
Income - Charitable activities £2.73k N/A £387 £0 £2.23k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £80 N/A £19 £580 £895
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £421.80k N/A £330.33k £339.63k £328.02k
Expenditure - Raising funds £63.49k N/A £46.68k £0 £114.13k
Expenditure - Governance £14.22k N/A £23.09k £27.69k £27.90k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £70.43k £0