THE GREEN HUT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Green Hut is a drop-in centre for the homeless, unemployed, disadvantaged or elderly people behind St Barnabas Church in Gorse Hill, Swindon and is open every weekday 9.30 to 2.00. It provides a range of help and advice in an informal, friendly and comfortable atmosphere. Drinks, snacks and hot lunches are available. The Green Hut is non-discrimanatory and open to anyone aged 16+.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 15 July 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Swindon
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 16 July 2003: Standard registration
- 23 August 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/07/2007 | 15/07/2008 | 15/07/2009 | 15/07/2010 | 15/07/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.48k | £12.69k | £17.50k | £8.54k | £24.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.35k | £19.34k | £20.26k | £23.54k | £20.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 July 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 15 July 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 15 July 2011 | 14 November 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 July 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 July 2010 | 21 November 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 July 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 July 2009 | 09 December 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 July 2009 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 13 MAY 2003
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE IN WILTSHIRE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP, OR DISTRESS, PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A DROP-IN CENTRE.
Area of benefit
WILTSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window