Accounts and annual returns THE DOVE AND THE DOLPHIN

Charity number: 1100119
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 11 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 17 January 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2009 31 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 27 January 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 10 April 2009 69 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 23 January 2009 On Time