Financial history THE DOVE AND THE DOLPHIN

Charity number: 1100119
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010
Total gross income £46.00k £28.18k £47.28k £82.04k £52.94k
Total expenditure £36.32k £29.17k £19.32k £68.19k £80.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A