INTERNATIONAL JATT FORUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Helping the young, poor and orphan children of school age financially to continue their Education and also providing medical facilities to poor needy people where possible.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 13 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Pakistan
Governance
- 13 August 2003: Standard registration
- IJF (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohammed Nawaz Cheema | Trustee | 25 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
SARFRAZ ANJUM KAHLON KAHLON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Ghulam Rasul Shaida | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 13/01/2020 | 13/01/2021 | 13/01/2022 | 13/01/2023 | 13/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £163 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 13 January 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 13 January 2023 | 12 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 13 January 2022 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 13 January 2021 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 13 January 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 JANUARY 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 24 JULY 2003.
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION IN THE LANGUAGE AND CULTURE OF THE JATT COMMUNITY (DEFINED AS THOSE PERSONS DERIVED MAINLY FROM PUNJAB AND MIRPUR AREA OF PAKISTAN AND INDIA) AND THE PROVISION OF RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, FOR THE MEMBERS OF THE JATT COMMUNITY IN THE UK.
Area of benefit
PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE UK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
64 Wellfields
Loughton
IG10 1NY
- Phone:
- 02036521678
- Email:
- grshaida@netscape.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window